Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/12/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/09/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/10/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/10/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/10/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/14/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/14/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/14/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/14/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/14/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/15/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/30/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/05/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/12/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/12/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/24/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/08/2008