Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/15/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/16/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/16/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/16/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/18/2008