There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal building located at 4600 Silver Hill Road in Suitland, Maryland, as the "Thomas Jefferson Census Bureau Headquarters Building".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/04/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR S4890)
06/03/2008Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-674.
03/12/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/05/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
06/04/2008-11:30amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/04/2008-11:30amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR S4890)
06/04/2008-11:23amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5599.
06/04/2008-11:23amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4890-4891)
06/04/2008-11:22amHouseMs. Johnson, E. B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/03/2008HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 227.
06/03/2008HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-674.
05/15/2008HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
05/15/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/15/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/13/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/12/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/12/2008HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E373)
03/12/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/12/2008 Referred to
05/15/2008 Markup by
06/03/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-674
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/13/2008 Referred to
05/15/2008 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works06/05/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5599.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5599. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/04/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the federal building located at 4600 Silver Hill Road in Suitland, Maryland, as the "Thomas Jefferson Census Bureau Headquarters Building."