Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/08/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/16/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/16/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/05/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/14/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/19/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/12/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/23/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/26/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/26/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/09/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/18/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/18/2008