Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/13/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/13/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/31/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/01/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/14/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/15/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/05/2008