Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/14/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/01/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/01/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/03/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/10/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/15/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/05/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/06/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/09/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/22/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2008