Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/08/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/15/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/15/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/23/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/29/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/30/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/08/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/17/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/26/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 08/01/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/23/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/29/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/29/2008