Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 01/18/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/18/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/24/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/24/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/05/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/12/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/20/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/25/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/03/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/03/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2007
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/09/2008