Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
08/12/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-307. (TXT | PDF)
08/12/2008 Signed by President.
08/06/2008 Presented to President.
08/01/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7984)
07/30/2008 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
04/29/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2827)
03/13/2008 Introduced in House