There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the importation of certain low-level radioactive waste into the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/13/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/20/2008Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality
03/19/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/13/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/13/2008Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2008Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2008Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/04/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/05/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/05/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/11/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/18/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/19/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/26/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/31/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/31/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/13/2008 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality03/13/2008 Referred to
05/20/2008 Hearings by
House Ways and Means03/13/2008 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade03/19/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5632. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2008)

Amends Atomic Energy Act of 1954 to prohibit the Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC) from issuing a license authorizing the importation into the United States of: (1) low-level radioactive waste; or (2) specific radioactive waste streams exempted from regulation under the Low-Level Radioactive Waste Policy Act.

Exempts from such prohibition low-level radioactive waste: (1) that is being returned to a U.S. government or military facility authorized to possess it; or (2) resulting from the use in a foreign country of nuclear material obtained by the foreign user from an entity in the United States that is being returned to the United States for management and disposal.

Authorizes the President to waive the prohibition and authorize the grant of a specific license only after finding that such importation would meet an important national or international policy goal.