Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/04/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/05/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/05/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/11/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/18/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/19/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/26/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/31/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/31/2008