Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/01/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/01/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/02/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/08/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/22/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 08/01/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/09/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/16/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/16/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/22/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/23/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/25/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/27/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/27/2008