Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/03/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/03/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/03/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/15/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/15/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/15/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/31/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/09/2008