Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/09/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2008