There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Poison Center Support, Enhancement, and Awareness Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Poison Center Support, Enhancement, and Awareness Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the poison center national toll-free number, national media campaign, and grant program to provide assistance for poison prevention, sustain the funding of poison centers, and enhance the public health of people of the United States.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/04/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 10 (Roll no. 373).(text: CR H4896-4897)
06/04/2008Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 110-681.
04/01/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
06/05/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
06/04/2008-4:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/04/2008-4:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 10 (Roll no. 373). (text: CR H4896-4897)
06/04/2008-4:35pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4936-4937)
06/04/2008-12:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/04/2008-11:58amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5669.
06/04/2008-11:58amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4896-4899)
06/04/2008-11:57amHouseMr. Green, Gene moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/04/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 426.
06/04/2008HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 110-681.
05/07/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/07/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/23/2008HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/23/2008HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/02/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/02/2008HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1943)
04/01/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/01/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (34)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/01/2008 Referred to
05/07/2008 Markup by
06/04/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-681
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/02/2008 Referred to
04/23/2008 Markup by
04/23/2008 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/05/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5669. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/04/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Poison Center Support, Enhancement, and Awareness Act of 2008 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to provide coordination and assistance for the maintenance of the nationwide toll-free phone number to access poison centers.

Changes the name of poison control centers to poison centers.

Requires the Secretary to carry out and expand upon a national media campaign to educate the public and health care providers about poison prevention and the availability of poison center resources in local communities. Authorizes the Secretary to enter into contracts with a nationally recognized organization for the development and implementation of a nationwide poison prevention and poison center awareness campaign.

Expands the poison center grant program to allow the Secretary to award grants for poison centers to comply with the operational requirements needed to sustain certification. Adds as the purposes for which such grants may be used: (1) to establish and evaluate best practices in the United States for poison prevention, poison center outreach, and emergency and preparedness programs; (2) to develop and implement standard patient management guidelines for commonly encountered toxic exposures; (3) to improve national toxic exposure surveillance; (4) to develop, support, and enhance technology and capabilities of professional organizations in the field of poison control to collect national poisoning, toxic occurrence, and related public health data; and (5) to develop initiatives to foster the enhanced public health utilization of national poison data. Eliminates matching requirements for such grants.

Authorizes appropriations for FY2010-FY2014.