Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/17/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/22/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/24/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/01/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/12/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/22/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/03/2008