Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 01/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/22/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/06/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/01/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/20/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/12/2007