Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 04/01/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/16/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/16/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/16/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/01/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/14/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/21/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/12/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/26/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/25/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/02/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/19/2008