Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/02/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/02/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/10/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/01/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/04/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/04/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/10/2008