Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/09/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/10/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/05/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/17/2008