Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/04/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/05/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/19/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/19/2008