Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/03/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/09/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/09/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/23/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/23/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/20/2008