Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/06/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/24/2007