Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/03/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/03/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/03/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/14/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/17/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/29/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/14/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/20/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/20/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/21/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/18/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/30/2008