Text: H.R.5712 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (04/30/2008)

 
[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 5712 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

  2d Session
                                H. R. 5712


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             April 24, 2008

                                Received

                             April 30, 2008

   Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and 
                          Governmental Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
  To require disclosure by Federal contractors of certain violations 
       relating to the award or performance of Federal contracts.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Close the Contractor Fraud Loophole 
Act''.

SEC. 2. REVISION OF THE FEDERAL ACQUISITION REGULATION.

    The Federal Acquisition Regulation shall be amended within 180 days 
after the date of the enactment of this Act pursuant to FAR Case 2007-
006 (as published at 72 Fed Reg. 64019, November 14, 2007) or any 
follow-on FAR case to include provisions that require timely 
notification by Federal contractors of violations of Federal criminal 
law or overpayments in connection with the award or performance of 
covered contracts or subcontracts, including those performed outside 
the United States and those for commercial items.

SEC. 3. DEFINITION.

    In this Act, the term ``covered contract'' means any contract in an 
amount greater than $5,000,000 and more than 120 days in duration.

            Passed the House of Representatives April 23, 2008.

            Attest:

                                            LORRAINE C. MILLER,

                                                                 Clerk.