Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/09/2008