Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/01/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-450.
12/01/2008 Signed by President.
11/20/2008 Presented to President.
11/17/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10601)
10/03/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
10/03/2008 Committee on Financial Services discharged.
04/08/2008 Introduced in House