Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/14/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/13/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/13/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/15/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/21/2008