Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/14/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/15/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/16/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/16/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/23/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/24/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/05/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/08/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/08/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/14/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/12/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/17/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2008