There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs outpatient clinic in Gadsden, Alabama, as the Colonel Ola Lee Mize Veterans Clinic.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/17/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/15/2008 H8072)
04/09/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/02/2008SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/22/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/17/2008-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/2008-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8368-8369)
09/17/2008-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/15/2008 H8072)
09/15/2008-4:17pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Stearns objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/15/2008-4:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5736.
09/15/2008-4:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8072-8073)
09/15/2008-4:06pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/09/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/09/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/18/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/18/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs04/09/2008 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/02/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5736.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5736. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/17/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) outpatient clinic in Gadsden, Alabama, as the "Colonel Ola Lee Mize Veterans Clinic."