Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/15/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/08/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/21/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/03/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/17/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/18/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/18/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/24/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/24/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/24/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/26/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/22/2008