Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/30/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/19/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2008