Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/14/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/14/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/14/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/14/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/14/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/14/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/15/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/22/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/22/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/23/2008