There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Walnut Canyon Study Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Walnut Canyon Study Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to jointly conduct a study of certain land adjacent to the Walnut Canyon National Monument in the State of Arizona, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/29/2008Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-799.
04/09/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
07/29/2008Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 517.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/2008Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-799.
07/16/2008Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/2008Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/16/2008Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
07/10/2008Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
04/14/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/09/2008Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/09/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/09/2008 Referred to
07/16/2008 Markup by
07/29/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-799
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands04/14/2008 Referred to
07/10/2008 Hearings by
07/16/2008 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5751. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (07/29/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Walnut Canyon Study Act of 2008 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to conduct a study of an area identified as the Walnut Canyon Proposed Study Area (the study area) to assess: (1) the suitability and feasibility of designating all or part of the study area as an addition to Walnut Canyon National Monument in Arizona; and (2) continued management of the study area by the Forest Service, or any other designation or management option that would provide for protection of resources within the study area and continued access to, and use of, the study area by the public.

Requires the Secretaries to provide for public comment in the preparation of the study, including with appropriate federal, state, and local governmental entities.