Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/04/2008