Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/13/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/21/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/24/2008