Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/10/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/10/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/16/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/16/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/29/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2008