Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/18/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/24/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/26/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/08/2008