Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/14/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/16/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/18/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/24/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/26/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/16/2008