Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/16/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/16/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/23/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/24/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/08/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/08/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/08/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/08/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/15/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/15/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/15/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/19/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/19/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/20/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/20/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/21/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/04/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/10/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/12/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/12/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/12/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/20/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/23/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/25/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/26/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/22/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/23/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/30/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/30/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/08/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/08/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/16/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/16/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/17/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/17/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/17/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/17/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/18/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/18/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/24/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/25/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/28/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/28/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/28/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/19/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/19/2008