Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 04/15/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/15/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/15/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/15/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/16/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/06/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/13/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2008