Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/14/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/22/2008