Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/22/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/22/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/22/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/22/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/22/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/22/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/22/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/08/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/12/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/22/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/22/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/19/2008