Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/05/2008