Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 04/16/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/13/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/13/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/13/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/19/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/19/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/22/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/04/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/09/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/09/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/17/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/30/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/30/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/30/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/09/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/16/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/25/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/25/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/19/2008