Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/30/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/30/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/30/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/07/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/15/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/07/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/21/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/21/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/21/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/21/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/27/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/25/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/25/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/15/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/15/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/06/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/22/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/11/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/11/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/01/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/11/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/11/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/03/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/03/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/03/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/03/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/03/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/03/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/03/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/03/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/09/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/01/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 08/01/2008