Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/17/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/01/2008