Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/08/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/13/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/17/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/23/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/22/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/26/2008