Refine your search

9 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/07/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-346.
10/07/2008 Signed by President.
09/26/2008 Presented to President.
09/23/2008 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H8659)
09/22/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2008 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/15/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 5/13/2008 H3747-3748)
05/13/2008 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 110-628.
04/17/2008 Introduced in House