There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2008

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2008

Short Titles as Reported to House

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2008

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the North Korean Human Rights Act of 2004 to promote respect for the fundamental human rights of the people of North Korea, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/07/2008Became Public Law No: 110-346. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2008Signed by President.
09/26/2008Presented to President.
09/23/2008Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H8659)
09/22/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2008Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/15/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 5/13/2008 H3747-3748)
05/13/2008Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 110-628.
04/17/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
10/07/2008Became Public Law No: 110-346. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2008Signed by President.
09/26/2008HousePresented to President.
09/23/2008-7:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2008-7:23pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H8659)
09/23/2008-7:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate H.R. 5834.
09/23/2008-7:07pmHouseMr. Scott (GA) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H8659-8661)
09/23/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/2008SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2008SenateS.Amdt.5632 Amendment SA 5632 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2008SenateS.Amdt.5632 Amendment SA 5632 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Dodd. (consideration: CR S9219; text: CR S9219) To make certain technical and clarifying amendments.
09/22/2008SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9218-9219)
09/22/2008SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/19/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
05/15/2008-3:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/15/2008-3:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 5/13/2008 H3747-3748)
05/15/2008-3:48pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4047)
05/13/2008-6:24pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Simpson objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
05/13/2008-6:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5834.
05/13/2008-6:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3747-3750)
05/13/2008-6:07pmHouseMr. Berman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/13/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 392.
05/13/2008HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 110-628.
04/30/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
04/30/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/17/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
04/17/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/17/2008 Referred to
04/30/2008 Markup by
05/13/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-628
Senate Foreign Relations05/19/2008 Referred to
09/22/2008 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5834.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.5834. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-346 (10/07/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 22, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2008 - Expresses the sense of Congress with respect to the resettlement of North Korean refugees.

Amends the North Korean Human Rights Act of 2004 to authorize appropriations through FY2012 for: (1) activities to support human rights and democracy and freedom of information (by increasing the availability of non-government controlled sources) in North Korea; and (2) assistance to North Koreans who are outside North Korea.

Directs the Broadcasting Board of Governors to report respecting U.S. broadcasting to North Korea and the extent to which the Board has achieved the goal of 12-hour-per-day broadcasting to North Korea.

States that the Special Envoy on North Korean human rights issues (as renamed by this Act) in North Korea shall have the rank of ambassador. Extends the Special Envoy's annual congressional reporting requirement through FY2012.

Extends the United States Agency for International Development's (USAID) congressional reporting requirement respecting U.S. humanitarian assistance to North Koreans and efforts to improve transparency and monitoring in the provision of such assistance inside North Korea through 2012.

Sets forth specified reporting provisions.